Accounts and annual returns 18TH PURLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required