Financial history CHILD AUTISM UK

Charity number: 1063982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £580.02k £515.93k £501.46k £489.36k £499.09k
Total expenditure £576.66k £558.54k £512.65k £473.56k £415.45k
Income from government contracts £130.84k N/A £64.89k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £205.33k £192.68k £249.82k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £346.33k £300.94k £251.64k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £28.36k £22.30k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £558.87k £540.47k £498.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.80k £18.07k £14.11k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.23k £7.20k £7.23k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A