Trustees MAGPIE DANCE
Charity number: 1062185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Wicks | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Samuel Francis | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailisha Ogunmefun | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn Prendergast | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Elinor Gardiner | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Bassett | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Lynch-Blosse | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Wilken Smith | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anaish Parmar | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wane | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||
VICTORIA SUSAN BRIGNELL | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.