Trustees 1ST NORTHOLT SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sinead Maria Brown Chair 01 June 2021
None on record
Upkar Bains Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Tanzilya Demonj Mrs Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
Georgina Johnson Trustee 31 March 2018
None on record
ANDREW FRITH Trustee 13 May 2013
None on record
KEN PLATT Trustee
None on record