Accounts and annual returns FAMILY LINKS (EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES)

Charity number: 1062514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window