Accounts and annual returns 16TH MORDEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 March 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required