Financial history 16TH MORDEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.88k £12.11k £8.81k £9.20k £36.70k
Total expenditure £7.06k £10.70k £9.22k £10.01k £28.45k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £10.00k