18TH EPPING FOREST SOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.29k £21.61k £21.00k £26.03k £28.98k
Total expenditure £14.74k £17.76k £18.54k £20.64k £11.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.10k