3RD CAMBERWELL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.19k £19.97k £26.16k £15.80k £12.47k
Total expenditure £13.35k £19.35k £17.71k £35.99k £18.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A