Financial history 8TH WANDSWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.90k £9.42k £13.58k £11.15k £4.95k
Total expenditure £7.19k £7.35k £9.42k £7.92k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A