BLOFIELD HEATH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 303909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs and maintains the community centre known as 'Heathlands'. The centre holds events which include pre school events, youth club, adult sports, local clubs and a day centre for the elderly. It is available resource for the local community. Outside the centre is a large grassed field used for outside events. Local and visiting football teams use an ajoining second field regularly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £47,063
Total expenditure: £52,811
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.
Trading
One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BLOFIELD HEATH RECREATION CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Thomas Willott Trustee 16 September 2017 None on record
JILL WILLOTT Trustee None on record
CLAIRE FRANCES NORTON Chair None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.73k £59.23k £88.83k £252.32k £47.06k
Total expenditure £50.77k £49.68k £57.63k £118.41k £52.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.25k £3.64k £8.21k £800 £17.05k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
58 MILL ROAD
BLOFIELD
NORWICH
NR13 4QS
Phone:
01603714164
Email:
No information available