Financial history KING'S LYNN UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 303992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.56k £8.71k £24.11k £8.76k £26.26k
Total expenditure £11.40k £9.11k £25.78k £12.46k £8.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.71k