Financial history INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity number: 1079573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.38m £5.89m £6.00m £6.02m £0
Total expenditure £5.34m £5.82m £5.79m £6.23m £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £54.99k £113.20k £116.21k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £57.72k £21.50k £508 £78.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £172.85k £208.43k £181.55k £171.68k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.11m £5.65m £5.82m £5.77m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £95 £26 £0 N/A
Income - Other £37.56k £6.20k £2.52k £2.67k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.14m £5.59m £5.57m £5.97m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £198.59k £223.02k £222.39k £265.94k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £37.39k £44.65k £27.27k £62.60k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A