Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.69k £9.01k £4.11k £23.06k £9.67k
Total expenditure £8.55k £23.45k £7.90k £6.02k £5.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.71k N/A