Financial history East Norfolk Scout District Council

Charity number: 304137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.42k £21.54k £4.82k £3.37k £1.78k
Total expenditure £15.25k £20.97k £3.29k £3.18k £1.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A