ROCK FOUNDATION YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 304242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.06k £3.46k £3.19k £3.18k £3.28k
Total expenditure £2.99k £1.48k £1.71k £1.10k £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A