Accounts and annual returns Great Milton Recreation Ground Management Committee

Charity number: 304308
Charity reporting is overdue by 502 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required