Financial history BUCKLAND ST MARY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.48k £6.49k £5.48k £5.01k £11.15k
Total expenditure £10.55k £10.55k £5.23k £4.78k £1.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k