Financial history MONTACUTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.46k £12.55k £10.58k £5.55k £11.91k
Total expenditure £24.65k £11.73k £5.04k £10.39k £4.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.47k £0 N/A N/A £10.00k