STREET CLUB AND INSTITUTE (CRISPIN HALL)

Charity number: 304646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 March 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 06 March 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 07 March 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 10 November 2016 10 days late Download