THE VICTORIA FIELD CHARITY

Charity number: 304648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £176.82k £137.63k £124.40k £203.36k £0
Total expenditure £162.51k £131.52k £133.66k £213.27k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £10.08k £30.71k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £10.08k N/A N/A