Accounts and annual returns WEST QUANTOXHEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required