Financial history BACTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304702
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.48k £3.88k £3.97k £3.70k £20.00k
Total expenditure £4.07k £4.49k £4.05k £4.22k £8.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A