STRATFORD ST MARY VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 304824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.86k £6.21k £6.25k £5.49k £11.85k
Total expenditure £8.37k £3.45k £5.71k £7.66k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k