BARDWELL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required