BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Gibson Trustee 26 March 2017 None on record
Dave Traher Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
FRANCES LEWIS Trustee None on record
Ian Anderson Trustee 18 March 2015 None on record
Keith Fuller Trustee 18 March 2015 None on record
DOROTHY ASHTON Trustee 06 June 2011 None on record
NANCY MARY LOUISE HIGGINS Trustee None on record
JACKIE STIRGES Trustee None on record
Janette Miller Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
FAITH RUTTERFORD Trustee None on record
CAROLINE LANCASTER Trustee None on record
Karen Colasante Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record