BOXFORD COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 304862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.41k £20.96k £12.71k £12.60k £2.08k
Total expenditure £15.20k £21.45k £11.81k £18.30k £2.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A