Financial history WHELNETHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 304890
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £40.88k £46.79k £33.13k £27.38k £34.15k
Total expenditure £32.38k £40.70k £30.96k £15.38k £28.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00k N/A £18.57k £12.00k