THE NEDGING WITH NAUGHTON VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 304930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2019 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 June 2019 587 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required