BANSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.73k £59.21k £60.18k £64.62k £42.66k
Total expenditure £42.48k £61.71k £55.39k £57.35k £50.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k