HOOLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.41k £6.72k £6.74k £8.22k £17.16k
Total expenditure £7.80k £6.55k £7.29k £7.66k £9.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k