PEBSHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305171
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £4.81k £22.40k £43.43k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.35k £18.78k £15.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.85k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A