FELPHAM MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £20.05k £20.80k £18.18k £16.87k £19.02k
Total expenditure £14.07k £13.30k £32.44k £14.84k £15.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k