Trustees FOVANT YOUTH CLUB
Charity number: 305517
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE ALISDAIR ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Leoni Amy Diana Long | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Wallis | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Peter Hobbs | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Patricia Wallis | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wilcock | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Brantingham | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||
AMANDA BASTIN | Trustee | 11 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOHN MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE ELENA MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.