Trustees THE ELLENDUNE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 305601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Jones | Chair | 12 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Ben Streeton | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Phillip Neil McMahon | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH FRANCES HOOPER | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Anne Cooper Parker | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Norman Jeffreys | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.