Financial history 23RD BATH (AVONVALE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305615
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.11k £17.11k £14.65k £14.84k £19.02k
Total expenditure £17.69k £17.69k £19.19k £18.48k £6.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k