Financial history 1ST BACTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.15k £5.35k £2.30k £2.03k £22.06k
Total expenditure £5.02k £4.66k £1.49k £1.92k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.71k