Trustees BURY ST EDMUNDS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 305673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Kristian Holman | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ashton Hunt | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Arthur Butler | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Karen Wade | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Chilestone | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Pitcher | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael John Golston | Trustee | 22 January 2011 |
|
|||||
BARBARA ANN RUTHVEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.