1ST WALTON-ON-THAMES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.19k £35.81k £42.16k £46.33k £41.38k
Total expenditure £18.43k £43.66k £27.02k £37.99k £35.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.24k