THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION GREATER LONDON WEST

Charity number: 305817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathy Gold Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Joan Pearson Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Angela Higgins Trustee 31 August 2017
WALLINGTON DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Dr Hilary Anne Jones Trustee 01 September 2018
GIRL GUIDING (CHEAM SOUTH DIVISION) Recently registered
Marguerite Landells Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Zoe Crimmings Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
CHRISTINE DONOVAN Chair 01 September 2017 None on record
Gwendolen Price Trustee 01 January 2009 None on record
JANET HILL Trustee
WALLINGTON DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Michelle Roberts Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Jacqueline Anne Junemann Trustee 26 November 2020
KINGSTON DISTRICT GUIDES Received: On time
VAL REID Trustee 25 July 2015 None on record