Trustees 1ST BUXTED (O'BRIEN'S OWN) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fraser Eastwood | Chair | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Heath | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Hampshire | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Morley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Brocklebank | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KERRY ANN WOOLLEY | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN RILEY | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.