1ST EAST PRESTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.43k £21.21k £25.70k £29.12k £35.02k
Total expenditure £23.28k £23.66k £23.25k £27.38k £29.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.71k N/A N/A