THE ARMY CADET FORCE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 305962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.43m £5.62m £4.26m £5.73m £4.44m
Total expenditure £9.33m £5.54m £4.09m £5.63m £4.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.80m £5.29m £3.94m £5.45m £4.14m
Income - Donations and legacies £24.96k £47.32k £48.57k £59.74k £4.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £61.44k
Income - Charitable activities £8.31m £5.46m £4.13m £5.59m £3.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £104.42k £117.47k £78.86k £80.02k £74.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £30.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.31m £5.52m £4.06m £5.62m £4.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.73k £18.25k £26.96k £14.88k £9.50k
Expenditure - Governance £23.07k £28.10k £30.12k £27.26k £29.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £309.57k
Expenditure - Investment management £17.73k £18.25k £26.96k £14.88k £9.50k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0