CONCORD VIDEO AND FILM COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 305990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £41.10k £43.22k £37.26k £59.17k £36.84k
Total expenditure £53.96k £41.28k £34.71k £65.46k £26.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A