ST PAUL'S GERMAN EVANGELICAL REFORMED CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1073905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £34.17k £33.22k £33.22k £35.08k £37.21k
Total expenditure £27.18k £17.00k £17.00k £31.57k £62.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A