Dogfen lywodraethu THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 26/10/1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 27/04/1960 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 04/09/1981 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 20/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 16/12/1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 10/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 30/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 14 FEB 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.