THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS

Charity number: 306025
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download