SION COLLEGE

Charity number: 306142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £148.78k £199.56k £170.39k £192.89k £133.20k
Total expenditure £129.92k £134.20k £154.16k £182.87k £151.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A