Trustees BISHOP OTTER TRUST

Charity number: 306344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Right Reverend Dr Martin Clive Warner Chair 17 December 2012
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MOTHER AGNES TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Ven Angela Martin Trustee 04 July 2021
None on record
The Venerable Luke Thomas Irvine-Capel Trustee 09 May 2019
FRERE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LANCING CHAPEL
Overdue by 22 days
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
The Ven Dr Edward Dowler Trustee 18 September 2016
THE FOREIGN ANGLICAN CHURCH AND EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE MOTHER AGNES TRUST
Received: On time
The Ven Martin Clifford Lloyd Williams Trustee 01 March 2015
TOGETHER IN SUSSEX
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time