TREVILSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM BONE Trustee 17 July 2014 None on record
Eliot Green Trustee 17 July 2014
CHARITY OF WILLIAM SEARLE Received: On time
Victoria Thorpe Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
Emma Shaughnessy Philp Trustee 13 September 2021 None on record
Rebecca Rowse Trustee 13 September 2021 None on record
HOWARD FARMER Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Kay Gulley Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record